Supreme Court

Case: 16-0897    
16-0897
11/07/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
NEIGHBORHOOD CENTERS INC. 
DOREATHA WALKER 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/15/2017Post submission brief filedPetitionerPost-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers, Inc.
08/14/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers Inc.
06/29/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentRespondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Doreatha Walker.
05/10/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers, Inc.
02/17/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers Inc.
02/17/2017Amended Response to Petition for Review filedRespondentAmended Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Doreatha Walker.
02/06/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Doreatha Walker.
11/07/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers, Inc.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/15/2018Case Stored e-stored
05/24/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
04/13/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/13/2018Concurring Opinion issued.IssuedJustice Johnson delivered a concurring opinion.
04/13/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed & judgment renderedThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and renders judgment. Chief Justice Hecht delivered the opinion of the Court.  Justice Blacklock did not participate in the decision.  
(4/13/2018 3:30:40 PM) 160897c.pdf, 160897.pdf, 16-0897.jmt.pdf
11/15/2017Post submission brief filed Post-Submission Letter Brief filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers, Inc.
11/07/2017Submission Schedule Submission Schedule for November 7, 2017.
11/07/2017Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Joseph E. Hoffer; Argued on behalf of respondent by Lorna McMillion
10/09/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form submitted on behalf of petitioner, Neighborhood Centers, Inc. Oral Argument will be presented by Joseph E. Hoffer of Schulman, Lopez, Hoffer & Adelstein, LLP of San Antonio, Texas.
10/09/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument will be presented by Lorna McMillion with King Law, P.C. of Lubbock, Texas, filed on behalf of Doreatha Walker.
09/22/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., November 7, 2017.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/22/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/22/2017Petition for Review granted  
08/14/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers Inc.
07/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits is granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Reply Brief is due August 14, 2017.
07/11/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers Inc.
06/29/2017Brief on the Merits Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Doreatha Walker.
05/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Respondent's Brief is due on June 29, 2017. Reply Brief is due on July 14, 2017.
05/22/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Doreatha Walker.
05/10/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers, Inc.
04/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Petitioner's brief is due May 10, 2017; Respondent's brief is due May 30, 2017; and Reply brief is due June 14, 2017.
04/05/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers, Inc.
03/15/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
03/13/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 1st COA
03/10/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than April 10, 2017; Response brief due May 1, 2017; Reply brief due May 16, 2017.
02/17/2017Reply to Response Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers Inc.
02/17/2017Amended Response to Petition for Review filed Amended Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Doreatha Walker.
02/16/2017Call received Call received from Ms. McMillion alerting the Court that an amended response will be filed.
02/14/2017Phone call from Clerk's Office Called attorney for respondent regarding correction to be made to response.
02/06/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Doreatha Walker.
01/06/2017Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response Requested response to petition for review due no later than February 6, 2017.
11/22/2016Case forwarded to Court  
11/18/2016Response Waiver filed Response Waiver filed on behalf of Doreatha Walker.
11/07/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of Neighborhood Centers, Inc.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/15/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Walker, DoreathaRespondentMs. Lorna L. McMillion
Neighborhood Centers, Inc.PetitionerMr. Joseph E. Hoffer  
Ms. Linda P. Wills
Mr. Bryan P. Dahlberg  
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
499 SW3d 16, 05-24-16 
1st Court of Appeals 
Honorable Evelyn Keyes 
Trial Court Information
80th District Court 
Harris 
Honorable Lawrence David Weiman 
2014-37034 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site