Supreme Court

Case: 16-0786    
16-0786
10/03/2016
Petition for Review/Cause under Rule 53.1
JOHN DAVID ADAMS 
STARSIDE CUSTOM BUILDERS, LLC 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/21/2018Motion for RehearingRespondent's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedMotion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
06/20/2017Reply BriefPetitionerReply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John David Adams.
06/02/2017Brief on the MeritsRespondentResponse Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
04/19/2017Brief on the MeritsPetitionerPetitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John David Adams.
01/23/2017Reply to ResponsePetitionerReply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of John David Adams.
01/06/2017Response to PetitionRespondentResponse to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
11/02/2016Petition for ReviewPetitionerPetition for Review filed on behalf of John David Adams.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/30/2018Case Stored e-stored
06/22/2018Mandate issued Mandate & Cost Bill Issued
06/22/2018Motion for Rehearing - DisposedDenied 
05/21/2018Case forwarded to Court  
05/21/2018Motion for Rehearing Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
05/04/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Motion for Rehearing is due no later than May 21, 2018.
05/04/2018Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
04/20/2018Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordIssued 
04/20/2018Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; remanded to Court of AppealsThe Court reverses the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court.  Justice Blacklock delivered the opinion of the Court.
(4/20/2018 2:36:44 PM) 160786.pdf, 16-0786.jmt.pdf
01/09/2018Submission Schedule  
01/09/2018Oral argument  Argued on behalf of petitioner by Byron Henry; Argued on behalf of respondent by Lindy D. Jones
12/12/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of petitioner, John David Adams. Oral Argument will be presented by Byron Henry of Scheef & Stone, LLP of Frisco, Texas.
11/28/2017Oral Argument Submission Form from Attorney received Oral Argument Submission Form filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC. Oral Argument will be presented by Lindy D. Jones of Jones, Allen & Fuquay, LLP of Dallas, Texas.
10/03/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Mr. Byron K. Henry will be out of the office November 6-10, 2017.
09/01/2017Case set for oral argumentCase set for oral argumentThis case has been set for oral argument at 9:00 a.m., January 9, 2018.  Time allotted to argue:  20/20 minutes
09/01/2017Petition for Review disposedFiling granted 
09/01/2017Petition for Review granted  
06/20/2017Reply Brief Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John David Adams.
06/02/2017Electronic communication sent to Party Informed petitioner and respondent counsel that the bookmarks were updated in the respondent's brief on the merits.
06/02/2017Brief on the Merits Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
05/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Response Brief is due on June 5, 2017. Reply Brief is due on June 20, 2017.
05/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Response Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
04/20/2017Case Record Filed  Electronic Appellate Record received.
04/19/2017Brief on the Merits Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John David Adams.
03/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedMotion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits has been granted. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. Petitioner's Brief is due on April 19, 2017. Response Brief is due on May 9, 2017. Reply Brief is due on May 24, 2017.
03/21/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of John David Adams.
02/21/2017Record Requested in Petition for Review Record requested from the 5th COA
02/17/2017Brief on the Merits Requested Brief on the merits requested:  Petitioner's brief due no later than March 20, 2017; Response brief due April 10, 2017; Reply brief due April 25, 2017.
02/13/2017Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates Vacation Notice of petitioner's counsel, Mr. Byron Henry, filed on behalf of John David Adams.
01/23/2017Reply to Response Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of John David Adams.
01/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedSecond Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review has been granted. Response was filed on January 6, 2017.
01/09/2017Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
01/06/2017Response to Petition Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
01/03/2017Case forwarded to Court  
11/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposedFiling grantedResponse due 01/02/17.
11/28/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Starside Custom Builders, LLC.
11/02/2016Petition for Review Petition for Review filed on behalf of John David Adams.
10/04/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposedFiling grantedUnopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is Granted. Petition for Review is due November 2, 2016.
10/03/2016Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of John David Adams.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/30/2018Case StoredCase stored.e-stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Adams, John DavidPetitionerMr. Byron K. Henry
Ms. Andrea K. Bouressa
Starside Custom Builders, LLCRespondentMs. Lindy D. Jones
Mr. Nathan Allen Jr.
Ms. Laura L. Worsham
Ms. Lynn Warren Schleinat
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed  
545 SW3d 572, 06-28-16 
5th Court of Appeals 
Honorable Robert M. Fillmore 
Trial Court Information
416th District Court  
Collin 
Honorable John Christopher Oldner 
416-01104-2015 
 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site