Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: WR-84,073-01    
WR-84,073-01
10/22/2015
11.07 HC
PENA, MARTIN  
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/10/2016RESPONSE FILEDApplicant
02/17/2016REPLY FILEDState
02/16/2016BRIEF FILEDState
02/16/2016BRIEF FILEDApplicant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/22/2018MANDATE ISSDDENIED
01/10/2018REHEAR DISP – HCDENIED
11/29/2017REHEAR FILED HC 
11/15/2017OPINION ISSDHABEAS CORPUS RELIEF DENIED
11/15/2017OPINION ISSDHABEAS CORPUS RELIEF DENIED
11/15/2017OPINION ISSDHABEAS CORPUS RELIEF DENIED
11/15/2017OPINION ISSDHABEAS CORPUS RELIEF DENIED
11/15/2017OPINION ISSDHABEAS CORPUS RELIEF DENIED
06/22/2016SUBMITTED 
06/02/2016SUBMISSION FILE & SET NOTICE 
06/02/2016SET FOR SUBMIS 
05/25/2016SUPP CR FILED 
04/26/2016MOTION DISPGranted
03/10/2016RESPONSE FILED 
03/09/2016MOTION FILED 
03/09/2016ORDER FILEDORDER ENTERED
02/17/2016REPLY FILED 
02/17/2016MOTION FILED 
02/16/2016BRIEF FILED 
02/16/2016BRIEF FILED 
12/18/2015SUPP CR FILED 
11/18/2015ORDER FILEDBRIEFS DUE ON FILE AND SET WRIT
11/18/2015WRIT FILED 
11/18/2015ACTION TAKENFile and set
10/22/2015WRIT RECEIVED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/05/2018STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateAndrew J. Smith
PENA, MARTIN ApplicantNicolas Hughes
Court of Appeals Information:
 
 
 
Trial Court Information
184th District Court 
Harris 
 
1379020-A 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site