Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1389-16    
PD-1389-16
01/05/2017
PDR Case Type
HERNANDEZ, LUIS MIGUEL 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/28/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
04/10/2017BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/28/2018COPY REQUEST PDR 
02/13/2018MANDATE ISSDJudgment of the Court of Appeals Reversed
01/10/2018OPINION ISSDJudgment of the Court of Appeals Reversed
08/16/2017SUBMITTED 
07/31/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
07/31/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
06/28/2017BRIEF FILED 
06/16/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
06/16/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
05/16/2017SUPP CR FILED 
04/10/2017BRIEF FILED 
03/20/2017ORDER ISSD/1.051 
03/08/2017PDR GRANTED 
03/08/2017PDR DISPGranted
01/12/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
01/05/2017PDR FILED 
01/05/2017MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD - DISPOSITIONGranted
01/05/2017MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FILED 
12/06/2016EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
12/06/2016EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/01/2018STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HERNANDEZ, LUIS MIGUELAppellantEric Labovitz
LUIS MIGUEL HERNANDEZ
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn R. Messinger
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
11-03-16 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
213th District Court 
Tarrant 
 
1331780D 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site