Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1359-17    
PD-1359-17
12/22/2017
PDR Case Type
BRIGGS, SANDRA COY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/06/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
04/23/2018BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/05/2018MANDATE ISSDReversed COA; Affirmed the Trial Court
10/03/2018OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Affirmed the Trial Court
07/25/2018SUBMITTED 
07/11/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
07/11/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
06/06/2018BRIEF FILED 
05/22/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
05/22/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
04/23/2018BRIEF FILED 
04/23/2018EXT BR PDR DISPGranted
04/23/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
04/12/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
03/21/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
03/21/2018PDR GRANTED 
03/21/2018PDR DISPGranted
01/10/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
12/22/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/05/2018MANDATEMANDATE ISSUED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateEnrico Baltazar Valdez
BRIGGS, SANDRA COYAppellantDayna L. Jones
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
11-21-17 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
186th District Court 
Bexar 
 
2011CR2567 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site