Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1346-17    
PD-1346-17
01/18/2018
PDR Case Type
ALFARO-JIMENEZ, PABLO 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/27/2018BRIEF FILEDState
05/30/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/15/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
08/15/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
06/27/2018BRIEF FILED 
05/30/2018BRIEF FILED 
05/11/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
05/11/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
04/11/2018PDR GRANTED 
04/11/2018PDR DISPGranted
02/26/2018AMENDED PDR FILED 
02/26/2018MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED PDRGranted
02/26/2018MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED PDRFiled
02/02/2018RESPONSE WAIVED 
01/26/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
01/18/2018AMENDED PDR FILED 
01/18/2018PDR FILED 
12/19/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
12/19/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateMary Beth Welsh
ALFARO-JIMENEZ, PABLOAppellantAngela Moore
Court of Appeals Information:
Other 
11-15-17 
4th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
186th District Court 
Bexar 
 
2014CR9248 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site