Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1300-16    
PD-1300-16
11/04/2016
PDR Case Type
RAMIREZ-TAMAYO, ELVIS ELVIS 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/09/2017BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
04/18/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
02/24/2017BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
11/22/2016RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/2017MANDATE ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
09/20/2017OPINION ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
06/09/2017BRIEF RECEIVED 
06/07/2017SUBMITTED 
05/19/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
05/19/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
04/18/2017BRIEF FILED 
04/18/2017EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
04/17/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
03/27/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
03/27/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
02/24/2017BRIEF FILED 
01/25/2017PDR GRANTED 
01/25/2017PDR DISPGranted
11/22/2016RESPONSE FILED 
11/18/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
11/04/2016PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/19/2017STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn R. Messinger
RAMIREZ-TAMAYO, ELVIS ELVISAppellantSteven Denny
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
10-05-16 
7th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
108th District Court 
Potter 
 
69523-E 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site