Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1299-16    
PD-1299-16
11/04/2016
PDR Case Type
FORD, KIMBERLY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/08/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellee
02/06/2017BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/2017MANDATE ISSDReversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court
09/20/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court
09/20/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court
04/19/2017SUBMITTED 
03/30/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
03/30/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
03/08/2017BRIEF FILED 
03/02/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
03/02/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
02/07/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
02/06/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
02/06/2017BRIEF FILED 
01/25/2017PDR GRANTED 
01/25/2017PDR DISPGranted
11/23/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
11/04/2016PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/19/2017STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
FORD, KIMBERLYAppelleeIrma Sanjines
STATE OF TEXASStateDouglas K. Norman
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
09-15-16 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
105th District Court 
Nueces 
 
13-CR-0073-D 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site