Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1289-17    
PD-1289-17
12/01/2017
PDR Case Type
JONES, DEDRIC D'SHAWN 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/09/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
04/25/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
04/25/2018PDR GRANTED 
04/25/2018PDR DISPGranted
12/13/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
12/01/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/25/2018STATUSSTATE'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateClinton Morgan
JONES, DEDRIC D'SHAWNAppellantAdam Banks Brown
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
08-01-17 
1st Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
248th District Court 
Harris 
 
1452040 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site