Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1189-15    
PD-1189-15
10/02/2015
PDR Case Type
FLORES, MAYRA 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/22/2018BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
05/02/2016BRIEF FILEDState
03/28/2016CORRECTED BRIEF FILEDAppellant
03/15/2016BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/27/2018MANDATE ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/27/2018PUBLISH MOTION TODENIED
06/22/2018BRIEF RECEIVED 
05/30/2018PUBLISH MOTION TO 
05/23/2018OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
05/23/2018OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
03/01/2017EXHIBITS FILED 
02/23/2017EXHIBIT ORDERED FROM TC OR COA 
06/15/2016EXHIBITS FILED 
06/08/2016EXHIBIT ORDERED FROM TC OR COA 
06/08/2016SUBMITTED 
05/16/2016NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
05/16/2016NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
05/16/2016NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
05/05/2016SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR PDRS 
05/05/2016SET FOR SUBMIS 
05/02/2016BRIEF FILED 
04/20/2016EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
04/19/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
04/18/2016NO BRIEF FILED 
03/28/2016CORRECTED BRIEF FILED 
03/23/2016MOTION DISPGranted
03/22/2016MOTION FILED 
03/15/2016BRIEF FILED 
02/29/2016EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
02/29/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
01/27/2016PDR GRANTED 
01/27/2016PDR DISPGranted
10/15/2015COA RECORD RECEIVED 
10/02/2015PDR FILED 
09/16/2015EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
09/16/2015EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/30/2018STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateState Prosecuting Attorney
Dan McCrory
FLORES, MAYRAAppellantRalphaell Wilkins
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
07-30-15 
1st Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
339th District Court 
Harris 
 
1280239 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site