Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1184-16    
PD-1184-16
10/19/2016
PDR Case Type
OWINGS, RICHARD CHARLES JR. 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/10/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
02/21/2017BRIEF FILEDState
11/15/2016RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/2017MANDATE ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
11/01/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
11/01/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
11/01/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/07/2017SUBMITTED 
05/19/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
05/19/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
04/10/2017BRIEF FILED 
03/27/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
03/27/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
02/21/2017BRIEF FILED 
02/01/2017PDR GRANTED 
02/01/2017PDR DISPGranted
01/30/2017ORDER FILED 
01/30/20174404H BAILDismissed
11/15/20164404H RESPONSE FILEDFiled
11/15/20164404H BAILFiled
11/15/2016RESPONSE FILED 
11/04/2016EXT RESP DISP/NFEGranted
11/04/2016EXT RESPONSE FILED 
10/27/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
10/19/2016PDR FILED 
10/18/2016PDR RECEIVED 
10/03/2016EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
10/03/2016EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/22/2017STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
OWINGS, Jr., RICHARD CHARLESAppellantRandall J. Ayers
STATE OF TEXASStateState Prosecuting Attorney
Kathryn Davis
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
08-30-16 
1st Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court 
Harris 
 
1454997 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site