Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1100-17    
PD-1100-17
10/05/2017
PDR Case Type
WOOD, CYNTHIA KAYE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/27/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
02/07/2018BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/2018SUBMITTED 
03/15/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
03/15/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
02/27/2018BRIEF FILED 
02/07/2018BRIEF FILED 
01/12/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
01/10/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
01/10/2018PDR GRANTED 
01/10/2018PDR DISPGranted
10/13/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
10/05/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateEric Kugler
WOOD, CYNTHIA KAYEAppellantTheodore Lee Wood
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
09-19-17 
1st Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
351st District Court 
Harris 
 
1445251 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site