Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1100-15    
PD-1100-15
08/26/2015
PDR Case Type
PROENZA, ABRAHAM JACOB 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/22/2016REPLY BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
03/16/2016BRIEF FILEDAppellant
02/16/2016BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/22/2017MANDATE ISSDAffirmed in part and remanded to the Court of Appeals
11/15/2017OPINION ISSDAffirmed in part and remanded to the Court of Appeals
11/15/2017OPINION ISSDAffirmed in part and remanded to the Court of Appeals
11/15/2017OPINION ISSDAffirmed in part and remanded to the Court of Appeals
04/13/2016SUBMITTED 
03/30/2016FOR NON ARGT CASES 
03/30/2016SET FOR SUBMIS 
03/22/2016REPLY BRIEF FILED 
03/22/2016MOTION DISPGranted
03/22/2016MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF 
03/16/2016BRIEF FILED 
02/16/2016BRIEF FILED 
01/20/2016LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
01/13/2016LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
01/13/2016PDR GRANTED 
01/13/2016PDR DISPGranted
09/22/2015EXT RESPONSE DISPDENIED
09/22/2015EXT RESPONSE FILED 
09/21/2015COA RECORD RECEIVED 
08/26/2015PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/11/2018STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PROENZA, ABRAHAM JACOBAppellantKristen Jernigan
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn R. Messinger
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
07-23-15 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
445th District Court 
Cameron 
 
10-CR-727-I 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site