Case: PD-1066-17    
PD-1066-17
10/25/2017
PDR Case Type
ROSS, DAI'VONTE E'SHAUN TITUS 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/13/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellee
03/13/2018BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/07/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
05/07/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
04/13/2018BRIEF FILED 
03/13/2018BRIEF FILED 
02/26/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
02/26/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
02/06/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
01/25/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
01/24/2018PDR GRANTED 
01/24/2018PDR DISPGranted
11/10/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
10/25/2017PDR FILED 
09/28/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
09/28/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/23/2018SUBMISSET FOR SUBM
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateNathan E. Morey
ROSS, DAI'VONTE E'SHAUN TITUSAppelleeMac Bozza
Ishan Sareen
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
08-02-17 
4th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 15 
Bexar 
 
519657 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site