Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1056-16    
PD-1056-16
09/08/2016
PDR Case Type
MOORE, HAROLD MICHAEL 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/22/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
01/06/2017BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/2017MANDATE ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
06/07/2017OPINION ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
06/07/2017OPINION ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
04/19/2017SUBMITTED 
03/30/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
03/30/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
02/22/2017BRIEF FILED 
02/02/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
02/02/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
01/06/2017BRIEF FILED 
12/20/2016LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
12/09/2016LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
12/07/2016PDR GRANTED 
12/07/2016PDR DISPGranted
09/22/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
09/08/2016PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/2017MANDATEMANDATE ISSUED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MOORE, HAROLD MICHAELAppellantWilliam Biggs
STATE OF TEXASStateLandon Wade
Mark C. Kratovil
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
08-11-16 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
396TH DISTRICT COURT 
Tarrant 
 
1394673D 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site