Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1049-16    
PD-1049-16
09/08/2016
PDR Case Type
HERNANDEZ, TEODORO MIGUEL 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/11/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
03/03/2017BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/23/2018SUBMITTED 
05/07/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
05/07/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
03/21/2018REHEAR DISP – GPDRGranted
03/21/2018REHEAR GRANTED - GPDR 
11/02/2017REHEAR FILED GPDR 
10/18/2017OPINION ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
10/18/2017OPINION ISSDCOA Reversed, Trial Court Reinstated
06/07/2017SUBMITTED 
05/19/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
05/19/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
04/11/2017BRIEF FILED 
04/05/2017ADDRESS CHANGE 
04/03/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
04/03/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
03/03/2017BRIEF FILED 
02/01/2017PDR GRANTED 
02/01/2017PDR DISPGranted
02/01/2017PDR DISPRefused
10/10/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
09/14/2016PDR FILED 
09/08/2016PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HERNANDEZ, TEODORO MIGUELAppellantKaren Oprea
STATE OF TEXASStateBrian Erskine
State Prosecuting Attorney
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
08-05-16 
6th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
428TH District Court 
Hays 
 
CR-14-0339 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site