Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0972-17    
PD-0972-17
09/06/2017
PDR Case Type
RAMJATTANSINGH, JASON 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/30/2017BRIEF FILEDState
09/15/2017RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/11/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
12/11/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
11/30/2017BRIEF FILED 
11/15/2017PDR GRANTED 
11/15/2017PDR DISPGranted
09/15/2017RESPONSE FILED 
09/15/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
09/06/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/2018STATUSAPPELLANT'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
RAMJATTANSINGH, JASONAppellantBrian W. Wice
STATE OF TEXASStateKathryn Davis
Court of Appeals Information:
Other 
08-10-17 
1st Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No 8 
Harris 
 
2019635 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site