Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0941-17    
PD-0941-17
10/31/2017
PDR Case Type
SIMS, CHRISTIAN VERNON 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/03/2018BRIEF FILEDState
04/03/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/13/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
06/13/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
05/03/2018BRIEF FILED 
04/03/2018BRIEF FILED 
03/13/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
03/13/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
02/21/2018NOTICE TO APPEAR 
02/14/2018PDR GRANTED 
02/14/2018PDR DISPGranted
11/14/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
10/31/2017PDR FILED 
09/27/2017NOTICE TO APPEAR 
08/29/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
08/29/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/27/2018SUBMISSET FOR SUBM
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SIMS, CHRISTIAN VERNONAppellantMichael Mowla
CHRISTIAN VERNON SIMS
STATE OF TEXASStateJeffrey Shell
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
07-20-17 
6th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
6th District Court 
Lamar 
 
26338 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site