Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0931-16    
PD-0931-16
09/08/2016
PDR Case Type
MARCOPOULOS, ANDREAS 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/13/2017REPLY BRIEF FILEDAppellant
05/09/2017BRIEF FILEDState
03/14/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/22/2018MANDATE ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
12/20/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
12/20/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/13/2017REPLY BRIEF FILED 
06/13/2017MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEFGranted
06/09/2017MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF 
06/07/2017SUBMITTED 
05/19/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
05/19/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
05/09/2017BRIEF FILED 
05/09/2017EXT BR PDR DISPGranted
05/09/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
04/17/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
04/17/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
03/14/2017BRIEF FILED 
02/23/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
02/23/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
02/07/2017NOTICE TO APPEAR 
01/25/2017PDR GRANTED 
01/25/2017PDR DISPGranted
09/23/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
09/08/2016PDR FILED 
08/15/2016EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
08/15/2016EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/05/2018STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MARCOPOULOS, ANDREASAppellantRobert J. Fickman
Carmen Roe
STATE OF TEXASStateState Prosecuting Attorney
Kimberly Stelter
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
04-14-16 
1st Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
248th District Court 
Harris 
 
1440970 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site