Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0880-16    
PD-0880-16
07/29/2016
PDR Case Type
LEE, RONALD EDGAR JR. 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/15/2017BRIEF FILEDState
02/16/2017LETTER BR FILEDState
02/13/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/06/2017MANDATE ISSDReversed COA; Judgment of Trial Court Reformed
10/04/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Judgment of Trial Court Reformed
10/04/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Judgment of Trial Court Reformed
04/19/2017SUBMITTED 
03/30/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
03/30/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
03/15/2017BRIEF FILED 
02/16/2017LETTER BR FILED 
02/13/2017BRIEF FILED 
01/23/2017NOTICE TO APPEAR 
01/11/2017PDR GRANTED 
01/11/2017PDR DISPGranted
10/06/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
09/29/2016PDR FILED 
08/23/2016MISC DOCUMENT FOR A PDR 
07/29/2016EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
07/29/2016EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/21/2017STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
LEE, Jr., RONALD EDGARAppellantRONALD EDGAR LEE Jr.
Paul W. Hanneman
STATE OF TEXASStateState Prosecuting Attorney
Britt Lindsey
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
06-30-16 
11th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
104th District Court 
Taylor 
 
19309B 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site