Case: PD-0878-17    
PD-0878-17
10/16/2017
PDR Case Type
MARTINEZ, JUAN JR. 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/08/2017BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/12/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
02/12/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
02/02/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
01/25/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
01/24/2018PDR GRANTED 
01/24/2018PDR DISPGranted
11/08/2017BRIEF RECEIVED 
10/31/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
10/16/2017PDR FILED 
10/16/2017EXT PDR DISPGranted
10/16/2017EXT PDR FILED 
09/14/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
09/13/2017EXT PDR FILED 
08/11/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
08/11/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MARTINEZ, Jr., JUANAppelleePatrick Overman
STATE OF TEXASStateEdward F. Shaughnessy III
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
07-13-17 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
156th District Court 
Bee 
 
B-14-2123-0-CR-B 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site