Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0812-17    
PD-0812-17
09/27/2017
PDR Case Type
GOLLIDAY, JOSHUA 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/03/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
03/23/2018BRIEF FILEDState
10/27/2017RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/13/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
06/13/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
05/03/2018BRIEF FILED 
04/20/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
04/20/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
03/23/2018BRIEF FILED 
03/07/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
03/07/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
02/07/2018PDR GRANTED 
02/07/2018PDR DISPGranted
10/27/2017RESPONSE FILED 
10/20/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
10/11/2017EXT RESP DISP/NFEGranted
10/11/2017EXT RESPONSE FILED 
09/27/2017PDR FILED 
08/03/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
08/03/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateDavid Curl
GOLLIDAY, JOSHUAAppellantDon Hase
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
07-27-17 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
371st District Court 
Tarrant 
 
1379815D 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site