Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0805-16    
PD-0805-16
07/15/2016
PDR Case Type
CAHILL, DAVID WAYNE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/14/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
12/28/2016BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
07/27/2016RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/13/2017RETURNED TO COA -- 69.4 T.R.A.P 
05/17/2017OPINION ISSDDismissed as improvidently granted
04/05/2017SUBMITTED 
03/09/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
03/08/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
03/06/2017MOTION TO RESET ORAL ARGUMENT DISPDENIED
03/03/2017MOTION TO RESET ORAL ARGUMENT  
03/02/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
03/01/2017SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR PDRS 
03/01/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
02/14/2017BRIEF FILED 
01/27/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
01/26/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
12/28/2016BRIEF FILED 
12/09/2016EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
12/09/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
11/09/2016PDR GRANTED 
11/09/2016PDR DISPGranted
08/17/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
08/09/2016COA RECORD OVERDUE 
07/27/2016RESPONSE FILED 
07/15/2016PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/13/2017STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CAHILL, DAVID WAYNEAppellantKristin Brown
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn R. Messinger
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
06-14-16 
5th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
380th District Court 
Collin 
 
380-81088-2012 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site