Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0804-17    
PD-0804-17
08/01/2017
PDR Case Type
GARCIA, EX PARTE SAMUEL OSVALDO 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
11/01/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
11/01/2017PDR GRANTED 
11/01/2017PDR DISPGranted
08/31/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
08/01/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/01/2017STATUSSPA'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GARCIA, SAMUEL OSVALDOAppelleeRafael De La Garza III
STATE OF TEXASStateStacey M. Soule
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
07-13-17 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
357th District Court 
Cameron 
 
02-CR-1042-E 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site