Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0790-17    
PD-0790-17
09/06/2017
PDR Case Type
THOMAS, KEITHRICK 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/07/2018REPLY BRIEF FILEDAppellant
02/16/2018BRIEF FILEDState
01/09/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/17/2018NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
04/16/2018NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
04/13/2018NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
04/06/2018SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR PDRS 
04/06/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
03/07/2018REPLY BRIEF FILED 
03/01/2018NOTICE TO APPEAR 
02/16/2018BRIEF FILED 
02/08/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
02/08/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
01/09/2018BRIEF FILED 
12/05/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
12/05/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
11/22/2017PDR GRANTED 
11/22/2017PDR DISPGranted
09/18/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
09/06/2017PDR FILED 
09/06/2017EXT PDR DISPGranted
09/06/2017EXT PDR FILED 
07/31/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
07/31/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/2018SUBMISSET FOR SUBM
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateClinton Morgan
THOMAS, KEITHRICKAppellantNicolette Westbrooks
Brian W. Wice
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
06-08-17 
14th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
230th District Court 
Harris 
 
1454620 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site