Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0771-16    
PD-0771-16
07/08/2016
PDR Case Type
PETE, EX PARTE ANDREW 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/05/2016RESPONSE FILEDState
12/02/2016BRIEF FILEDAppellant
11/01/2016BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/23/2017MANDATE ISSDReversed COA; Remanded Trial Court
04/26/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded Trial Court
02/01/2017SUBMITTED 
01/27/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/12/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/11/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/05/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
12/29/2016SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR PDRS 
12/29/2016SET FOR SUBMIS 
12/12/2016MOTION TO DISMISS DISPOSEDDENIED
12/05/2016RESPONSE FILED 
12/02/2016DISMISS MOTION TOFiled
12/02/2016BRIEF FILED 
11/01/2016BRIEF FILED 
10/14/2016EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
10/14/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
09/27/2016LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
09/14/2016LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
09/14/2016PDR GRANTED 
09/14/2016PDR DISPGranted
08/29/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
08/10/2016PDR FILED 
07/08/2016EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
07/08/2016EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/2017STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateBrian Higginbotham
PETE, ANDREWAppellantScottie D. Allen
Lysette Rios
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
06-08-16 
5th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
292nd District Court 
Dallas 
 
F12-33559-V 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site