Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0745-18    
PD-0745-18
07/20/2018
PDR Case Type
DIRUZZO, JOSEPH ANDREW 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/29/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/29/2018BRIEF FILED 
09/26/2018PDR GRANTED 
09/26/2018PDR DISPGranted
07/30/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
07/20/2018PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/2018STATUSSTATE'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
DIRUZZO, JOSEPH ANDREWAppellantSteven R. LaFuente
STATE OF TEXASState 
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
04-26-18 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
24th District Court 
Victoria 
 
14-05-27939-A 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site