Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0736-17    
PD-0736-17
07/12/2017
PDR Case Type
LEE, JOHN KENNETH 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/14/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
03/14/2018BRIEF RECEIVEDAppellant
12/12/2017BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/2018SUBMITTED 
03/19/2018MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTDENIED
03/16/2018MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT 
03/15/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
03/15/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
03/14/2018BRIEF FILED 
03/14/2018EXT BR PDR DISPGranted
03/14/2018BRIEF RECEIVED 
03/14/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
03/12/2018NO BRIEF FILED 
03/06/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
03/02/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
03/01/2018NO BRIEF FILED 
02/26/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
02/13/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
01/30/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
01/29/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
01/25/2018NO BRIEF FILED 
12/22/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
12/12/2017BRIEF FILED 
12/11/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
11/15/2017PDR GRANTED 
11/15/2017PDR DISPGranted
08/08/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
07/12/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateBrendan Wyatt Guy
LEE, JOHN KENNETHAppellantArnold Hayden Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
06-15-17 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2 
Victoria 
 
2-103764 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site