Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0715-17    
PD-0715-17
09/20/2017
PDR Case Type
SMITH, JOSEPH ANTHONY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/12/2018EXT BR PDR DISPDENIED
02/12/2018MOTION DISPDENIED
02/12/2018SUPP CR FILED 
01/08/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
01/08/2018MOTION FILED 
12/13/2017ORDER ISSD/1.051 
12/13/2017PDR GRANTED 
12/13/2017PDR DISPGranted
09/25/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
09/20/2017PDR FILED 
09/20/2017MOT SUSPEND 9.3(B)Granted
09/20/2017MOT SUSPEND 9.3(B)Filed
07/07/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
07/07/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASState 
SMITH, JOSEPH ANTHONYAppellantSarah V. Wood
JOSEPH ANTHONY SMITH
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
03-09-17 
14th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
228th District Court 
Harris 
 
1336966 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site