Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0712-16    
PD-0712-16
06/28/2016
PDR Case Type
PRICHARD, ROBERT MONTE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/21/2017BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
11/02/2016BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
10/21/2016BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/24/2017MANDATE ISSDReversed COA; Remanded Trial Court
08/23/2017REHEAR DISP – GPDRDENIED
08/21/2017BRIEF RECEIVED 
08/07/2017MOTION RECEIVED 
07/13/2017REHEAR FILED GPDR 
06/28/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded Trial Court
06/28/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded Trial Court
06/28/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded Trial Court
12/14/2016SUBMITTED 
11/30/2016FOR NON ARGT CASES 
11/30/2016SET FOR SUBMIS 
11/02/2016BRIEF FILED 
10/21/2016BRIEF FILED 
10/03/2016NOTICE TO APPEAR 
09/28/2016PDR GRANTED 
09/28/2016PDR DISPGranted
07/26/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
06/28/2016PDR FILED 
06/28/2016EXT PDR DISPGranted
06/28/2016EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/19/2017STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateStacey M. Soule
PRICHARD, ROBERT MONTEAppellantCatherine Clare Bernhard
Court of Appeals Information:
Other 
04-20-16 
5th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
204th District Court 
Dallas 
 
F14-00386-Q 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site