Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0711-18    
PD-0711-18
07/31/2018
PDR Case Type
ADAMS, EX PARTE BRANDON JOSEPH  
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/30/2018BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/30/2018BRIEF FILED 
09/21/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
09/21/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
09/19/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
09/12/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
09/12/2018PDR GRANTED 
09/12/2018PDR DISPGranted
08/13/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
07/31/2018PDR FILED 
07/11/2018EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
07/11/2018EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/29/2018STATUSAPPELLANT'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ADAMS, BRANDON JOSEPHAppellantKevin W. Willhelm
STATE OF TEXASStateBritt Lindsey
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
6/14/2018 
11th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
42nd District Court 
Taylor 
 
26815-A 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site