Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0710-17    
PD-0710-17
07/07/2017
PDR Case Type
GARRELS, EX PARTE ELIZABETH ANN 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/27/2017BRIEF FILEDState
10/10/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2018SUBMITTED 
02/07/2018ADDITIONAL LIST OF AUTHORITIES 
01/08/2018NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/05/2018NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/04/2018NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/03/2018SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR PDRS 
01/03/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
11/27/2017BRIEF FILED 
11/10/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
11/10/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
10/10/2017BRIEF FILED 
09/22/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
09/22/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
08/23/2017PDR GRANTED 
08/23/2017PDR DISPGranted
08/02/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
07/07/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASState 
GARRELS, ELIZABETH ANNAppellantMatthew J. DeLuca
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
05-10-17 
9th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5 
Montgomery 
 
17-29859 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site