Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0703-16    
PD-0703-16
07/19/2016
PDR Case Type
HOPPER, STEPHEN HENRY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/03/2017REPLY BRIEF FILEDState
01/25/2017REPLY BRIEF FILEDAppellant
12/14/2016BRIEF FILEDAppellant
12/06/2016BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/2017MANDATE ISSDAffirmed COA
06/12/2017CORRECTED OPINION 
06/07/2017OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
06/07/2017OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
04/05/2017SUBMITTED/2 
04/05/2017SUBMITTED 
03/15/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
03/13/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
03/02/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
03/01/2017SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR PDRS 
03/01/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
02/03/2017REPLY BRIEF FILED 
02/03/2017EXT BR PDR DISPGranted
02/02/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
01/25/2017REPLY BRIEF FILED 
01/23/2017EXT BR PDR DISPGranted
01/20/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
01/18/2017NO BRIEF FILED 
01/18/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
01/18/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
12/14/2016BRIEF FILED 
12/14/2016EXT BR PDR DISPGranted
12/14/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
12/06/2016EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
12/06/2016BRIEF FILED 
12/05/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
11/21/2016EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
11/21/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
11/18/2016EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
11/18/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
10/19/2016PDR GRANTED 
10/19/2016PDR DISPGranted
10/19/2016PDR GRANTED 
10/19/2016PDR DISPGranted
08/08/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
07/27/2016PDR FILED 
07/19/2016PDR FILED 
07/19/2016EXT PDR DISPGranted
07/19/2016EXT PDR FILED 
06/27/2016EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
06/27/2016EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/2017MANDATEMANDATE ISSUED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HOPPER, STEPHEN HENRYAppellantSarah V. Wood
STATE OF TEXASStateClinton Morgan
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
05-10-16 
14th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
339th District Court 
Harris 
 
673236 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site