Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0639-18    
PD-0639-18
06/21/2018
PDR Case Type
GRIFFITH, DAVID RAY 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/16/2018AMENDED BRIEF FILEDAppellant
11/06/2018REPLY BRIEF FILEDAppellant
11/05/2018BRIEF FILEDState
10/29/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/16/2018AMENDED BRIEF FILED 
11/15/2018ORDER FILED 
11/15/2018MOTION DISPDENIED
11/13/2018MOTION FILED 
11/06/2018REPLY BRIEF FILED 
11/05/2018BRIEF FILED 
10/29/2018BRIEF FILED 
10/24/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
10/24/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
09/26/2018PDR GRANTED 
09/26/2018PDR DISPGranted
06/27/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
06/21/2018PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/05/2018AT ISSUEAT ISSUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateRobert Koehl
GRIFFITH, DAVID RAYAppellantNiles Illich
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
04-04-18 
10th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
County Court 
Navarro 
 
C-35408-CR 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site