Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0638-17    
PD-0638-17
07/14/2017
PDR Case Type
BEHAM, RODERICK 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/27/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
11/10/2017BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/14/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
02/14/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
12/27/2017BRIEF FILED 
12/07/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
12/07/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
11/10/2017BRIEF FILED 
11/07/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
11/07/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
10/06/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
10/04/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
10/04/2017PDR GRANTED 
10/04/2017PDR DISPGranted
08/08/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
07/14/2017PDR FILED 
06/20/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
06/20/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BEHAM, RODERICKAppellantAlwin Smith
STATE OF TEXASStateEmily Johnson-Liu
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
05-19-17 
6th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
5th District Court 
Bowie 
 
14F0004-005 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site