Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0623-16    
PD-0623-16
06/07/2016
PDR Case Type
ARIZMENDI, ROSA ELENA 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/22/2016BRIEF FILEDAppellee
10/07/2016BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/12/2017MANDATE ISSDReversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court
05/22/2017CORRECTED OPINION 
05/17/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court
05/17/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court
05/17/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court
05/17/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA & Trial Court;Remanded to Trial Court
12/14/2016SUBMITTED 
11/30/2016FOR NON ARGT CASES 
11/30/2016SET FOR SUBMIS 
11/22/2016BRIEF FILED 
10/20/2016CCA CORRESPONDENCE SENT 
10/20/2016TC APPT COUNSEL 
10/11/2016ORDER FILED 
10/07/2016BRIEF FILED 
09/14/2016LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
09/14/2016PDR GRANTED 
09/14/2016PDR DISPGranted
06/10/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
06/07/2016PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/2017STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateStacey M. Soule
ARIZMENDI, ROSA ELENAAppelleeDarrell R. Carey
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
05-19-16 
7th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
108th District Court 
Potter 
 
68,589-E 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site