Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0618-16    
PD-0618-16
06/07/2016
PDR Case Type
BECK, EX PARTE CLINTON DAVID 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/21/2016AMENDED BRIEF FILEDState
12/20/2016BRIEF FILEDState
11/01/2016BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/22/2017MANDATE ISSDAffirmed COA
12/18/2017MOTION DISPGranted
12/04/2017MOTION FILED 
11/22/2017OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
11/22/2017OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
04/18/2017ADDITIONAL LIST OF AUTHORITIES 
03/29/2017ADDITIONAL LIST OF AUTHORITIES 
02/15/2017ADDITIONAL LIST OF AUTHORITIES 
02/15/2017ADDITIONAL LIST OF AUTHORITIES 
02/15/2017SUBMITTED 
01/23/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/23/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/18/2017NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT 
01/11/2017ADDITIONAL LIST OF AUTHORITIES 
01/11/2017MOTION RECEIVEDNO ACTION TAKEN
01/11/2017SUBMIS ARGT NOTICE FOR PDRS 
01/11/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
12/21/2016AMENDED BRIEF FILED 
12/21/2016MOTION DISPGranted
12/21/2016MOTION FILED 
12/20/2016BRIEF FILED 
12/02/2016EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
12/02/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
11/01/2016BRIEF FILED 
10/11/2016EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
10/11/2016EXT BR PDR FILED 
09/14/2016PDR GRANTED 
09/14/2016PDR DISPGranted
06/16/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
06/07/2016PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/11/2018STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BECK, CLINTON DAVIDAppellantTerri R. Zimmerman
STATE OF TEXASStateJoshua Presley
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
05-04-16 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
207th District Court 
Comal 
 
CR2011-197 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site