Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0563-17    
PD-0563-17
07/05/2017
PDR Case Type
LANG, TERRI REGINA 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/31/2018BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
01/04/2018BRIEF FILEDState
11/20/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/14/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
02/14/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
01/31/2018BRIEF RECEIVED 
01/04/2018BRIEF FILED 
12/18/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
12/18/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
11/20/2017BRIEF FILED 
11/07/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
11/07/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
10/04/2017NOTICE TO APPEAR 
10/04/2017PDR GRANTED 
10/04/2017PDR DISPGranted
07/17/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
07/05/2017PDR FILED 
06/01/2017EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
06/01/2017EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
LANG, TERRI REGINAAppellantJustin Bradford Smith
STATE OF TEXASStateGary W. Bunyard
Court of Appeals Information:
Other 
05-05-17 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
424th District Court 
Burnet 
 
42185 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site