Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0561-18    
PD-0561-18
07/03/2018
PDR Case Type
BELTRAN DE LA TORRE, LISANDRO  
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/31/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
10/31/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
10/04/2018NOTICE TO APPEAR 
10/03/2018PDR GRANTED 
10/03/2018PDR DISPGranted
08/07/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
07/03/2018PDR FILED 
06/05/2018EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
06/05/2018EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/19/2018STATUSAPPELLANT'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateEmily Johnson-Liu
BELTRAN DE LA TORRE, LISANDROAppellantSteven J. Lieberman
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
3/15/2018 
1st Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
25th District Court 
Colorado 
 
CR-16-082 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site