Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0560-18    
PD-0560-18
06/04/2018
PDR Case Type
COUTHREN, DONALD  
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/13/2018BRIEF FILEDState
10/12/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/2018BRIEF FILED 
10/12/2018BRIEF FILED 
09/12/2018PDR GRANTED 
09/12/2018PDR DISPGranted
06/14/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
06/04/2018PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
COUTHREN, DONALDAppellantClint Foster Sare
STATE OF TEXASState 
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
5/03/2018 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
361st District Court 
Brazos 
 
12-04815-CRF-361 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site