Case: PD-0556-18    
PD-0556-18
07/06/2018
PDR Case Type
STAHMANN, KARL DEAN  
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/13/2018BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/2018BRIEF FILED 
10/22/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
10/10/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
10/10/2018PDR GRANTED 
10/10/2018PDR DISPGranted
07/13/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
07/06/2018PDR FILED 
06/04/2018EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
06/04/2018EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STAHMAN, KARL DEANAppellantChristopher P. Morgan
Joshua Presley
STATE OF TEXASState 
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
1/04/2018 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
207th District Court 
Comal 
 
CR2013-409 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site