Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0538-17    
PD-0538-17
05/26/2017
PDR Case Type
ETTE, EDDIE OFFIONG 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/19/2017BRIEF FILEDState
09/28/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2018SUBMITTED 
12/28/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
12/28/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
10/19/2017BRIEF FILED 
09/28/2017BRIEF FILED 
09/13/2017PDR GRANTED 
09/13/2017PDR DISPGranted
06/09/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
05/26/2017PDR FILED 
05/26/2017PDR RECEIVED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateSteven W. Conder
ETTE, EDDIE OFFIONGAppellantDaniel Collins
Court of Appeals Information:
Other 
05-18-17 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
 
1363508D 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site