Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0527-18    
PD-0527-18
06/29/2018
PDR Case Type
BURG, JAMES ALLAN II 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/29/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/29/2018BRIEF FILED 
10/09/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
10/09/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
09/12/2018PDR GRANTED 
09/12/2018PDR DISPGranted
07/16/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
06/29/2018PDR FILED 
05/24/2018EXT PDR DISP/NFEGranted
05/24/2018EXT PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/2018STATUSSTATE'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASState 
BURG, II, JAMES ALLANAppellantMatthew J. DeLuca
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
4/11/2018 
9th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1 
Montgomery 
 
15-307592 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site