Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0514-17    
PD-0514-17
05/24/2017
PDR Case Type
SMITH, FERNANDO 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/20/2017BRIEF FILEDState
10/04/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/24/2018SUBMITTED 
01/12/2018FOR NON ARGT CASES 
01/12/2018SET FOR SUBMIS 
11/20/2017BRIEF FILED 
11/01/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
11/01/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
10/04/2017BRIEF FILED 
09/22/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
09/22/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
08/23/2017PDR GRANTED 
08/23/2017PDR DISPGranted
06/02/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
05/24/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateCharles Karakashian Jr.
SMITH, FERNANDOAppellantJustin Bradford Smith
Court of Appeals Information:
Other 
04-26-17 
10th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
52nd District Court 
Coryell 
 
20141 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site