Case: PD-0503-17    
PD-0503-17
05/22/2017
PDR Case Type
DELACRUZ, GEORGE 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/08/2017RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/26/2017PDR GRANTED 
07/26/2017PDR DISPGranted
06/08/2017RESPONSE FILED 
05/26/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
05/22/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/25/2017STATUSAPPELLANT'S BRIEF DUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASState 
DELACRUZ, GEORGEAppellantLinda Icenhauer-Ramirez
Court of Appeals Information:
Other 
04-21-17 
3rd Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
147th District Court 
Travis 
 
D-1-DC-13-900252 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site