Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0498-17    
PD-0498-17
05/22/2017
PDR Case Type
ROGERS, WILLIAM 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/14/2017BRIEF FILEDState
10/12/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/10/2017BRIEF RECEIVEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2018SUBMITTED 
12/28/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
12/28/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
11/14/2017BRIEF FILED 
10/12/2017BRIEF FILED 
10/12/2017EXT BR PDR DISPGranted
10/12/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
10/10/2017BRIEF RECEIVED 
09/22/2017EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
09/22/2017EXT BR PDR FILED 
08/23/2017PDR GRANTED 
08/23/2017PDR DISPGranted
06/02/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
05/22/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ROGERS, WILLIAMAppellantLuis A. Martinez
STATE OF TEXASStateStephen Charles Manning
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
03-09-17 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
24th District Court 
Refugio 
 
2013-4-5466 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site