Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0480-17    
PD-0480-17
05/19/2017
PDR Case Type
MACIAS, EX PARTE HECTOR 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/08/2017BRIEF FILEDAppellant
07/27/2017BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/20/2018WRIT OF CERT USSCDENIED
03/05/2018WRIT OF CERT USSCFiled
01/02/2018MOTION DISPDENIED
12/27/2017MOTION FILED 
12/22/2017MANDATE ISSDReversed COA; Affirmed the Trial Court
12/13/2017REHEAR DISP – GPDRDENIED
11/20/2017SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR REHEARING 
11/07/2017REHEAR FILED GPDR 
11/01/2017OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Affirmed the Trial Court
10/04/2017SUBMITTED 
09/20/2017FOR NON ARGT CASES 
09/20/2017SET FOR SUBMIS 
08/08/2017BRIEF FILED 
07/27/2017BRIEF FILED 
07/07/2017LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
07/03/2017LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
06/28/2017PDR GRANTED 
06/28/2017PDR DISPGranted
06/02/2017COA RECORD RECEIVED 
05/19/2017PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/22/2017STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateLily Stroud
MACIAS, HECTORAppellantMaximino Daniel Munoz
Matthew Mateo Dekoatz
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
12-14-16 
8th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No. 4 
El Paso 
 
20110C03140 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site