Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0474-18    
PD-0474-18
05/09/2018
PDR Case Type
PARKER, ADRIAN JEROME 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/07/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
07/16/2018BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/07/2018BRIEF FILED 
07/16/2018BRIEF FILED 
06/20/2018PDR GRANTED 
06/20/2018PDR DISPGranted
06/20/2018PDR DISPRefused
05/23/2018MISC DOCUMENT FOR A PDR 
05/17/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
05/14/2018MISC DOCUMENT FOR A PDR 
05/11/2018PDR FILED 
05/09/2018PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/07/2018AT ISSUEAT ISSUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateEmily Johnson-Liu
PARKER, ADRIAN JEROMEAppellantLew Dunn
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
04-11-18 
6th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
188th District Court 
Gregg 
 
44950-A 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site