Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0438-18    
PD-0438-18
04/25/2018
PDR Case Type
HYLAND, RICHARD 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/17/2018BRIEF FILEDAppellant
08/31/2018BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/17/2018BRIEF FILED 
10/02/2018EXT BR PDR DISPNFEGranted
10/02/2018EXT BR PDR FILED 
09/04/2018LTR 1.051 RESP REC 
08/31/2018BRIEF FILED 
08/22/2018LTR 1.051 REQ RESP 
08/22/2018PDR GRANTED 
08/22/2018PDR DISPGranted
05/01/2018COA RECORD RECEIVED 
04/25/2018PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/2018AT ISSUEAT ISSUE
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HYLAND, RICHARDAppellantChristopher A. Dorsey
John Gilmore
STATE OF TEXASStateDouglas K. Norman
Tara Tzitzon
David Jakubowski
Court of Appeals Information:
Reversed 
04-05-18 
13th Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
319th District Court 
Nueces 
 
14-CR-3456-G 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site