Court of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0429-16    
PD-0429-16
04/21/2016
PDR Case Type
ESTES, RUSSELL LAMAR 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/30/2016REPLY BRIEF FILEDAppellant
11/14/2016REPLY BRIEF FILEDAppellant
11/09/2016REPLY BRIEF FILEDState
10/21/2016AMENDED BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/17/2016BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/14/2016BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/07/2018MANDATE ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
05/09/2018OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
05/09/2018OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
05/09/2018OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
12/14/2016SUBMITTED/2 
12/14/2016SUBMITTED 
11/30/2016REPLY BRIEF FILED 
11/30/2016MOTION DISPGranted
11/30/2016FOR NON ARGT CASES 
11/30/2016SET FOR SUBMIS 
11/30/2016SET FOR SUBMIS 
11/29/2016MOTION FILED 
11/14/2016REPLY BRIEF FILED 
11/09/2016REPLY BRIEF FILED 
10/21/2016AMENDED BRIEF FILED 
10/21/2016MOTION TO FILE AMENDED BRIEFGranted
10/20/2016MOTION TO FILE AMENDED BRIEF 
10/17/2016BRIEF FILED 
10/14/2016BRIEF FILED 
09/14/2016PDR GRANTED 
09/14/2016PDR DISPGranted
09/14/2016PDR GRANTED 
09/14/2016PDR DISPGranted
04/28/2016PDR FILED 
04/28/2016COA RECORD RECEIVED 
04/21/2016PDR FILED 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/21/2018STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateSteven W. Conder
State Prosecuting Attorney
ESTES, RUSSELL LAMARAppellantAdam Arrington
Brian Salvant
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed 
03-24-16 
2nd Court of Appeals 
Trial Court Information
396TH DISTRICT COURT 
Tarrant 
 
1388628R 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site